GA HB91 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 10 of Title 17 and Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the procedure for sentencing and imposition of punishment and the issuance, expiration, and renewal of drivers' licenses, respectively, so as to provide that any person convicted of a felony offense shall have such conviction demarcated on his or her driver's license for the length of his or her sentence; to provide for procedure; to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to cancellation, suspension, and revocation of licenses, so as to provide for license suspension under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drivers' licenses; felony offense demarcated on license; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-10 - House - House Vote #132 - Passage (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 29 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-22 Senate Read Second Time
2012-03-22 Senate Committee Favorably Reported
2011-03-11 Senate Read and Referred
2011-03-10 House Passed/Adopted
2011-03-10 House Third Readers
2011-03-08 House Postponed
2011-03-07 House Postponed
2011-03-04 House Postponed
2011-03-03 House Postponed
2011-03-02 House Postponed
2011-03-01 House Postponed
2011-02-28 House Postponed
2011-02-24 House Postponed
2011-02-23 House Postponed
2011-02-22 House Postponed
2011-02-17 House Postponed
2011-02-10 House Committee Favorably Reported
2011-02-01 House Second Readers
2011-01-31 House First Readers

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback