GA HB908 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to provide that certain individuals who are 20 years old or older may be eligible to enroll in a state charter school that provides instruction for over-age students; to provide for an exception to the maximum age of eligibility enrollment; to authorize the State Charter Schools Commission to approve state charter schools that serve an over-age population; to provide for funding for such state charter schools; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; certain individuals over 20 years old may be eligible to enroll in a state charter school; provide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-13HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-12HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback