GA HB906 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to off-road vehicles, so as to authorize the civil forfeiture of any off-road vehicle operated while driving recklessly or fleeing police; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; civil forfeiture of any off-road vehicle operated while driving recklessly or fleeing police; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. Tyler Smith [R] |
Rep. Barry Fleming [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-13 | House | House Hopper |