GA HB906 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 18 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to inspection of public records, so as to exclude public disclosure of personal information of certain foster parents or former foster parents; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public records; public disclosure of personal information of certain foster parents; exclude

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #863 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #810 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #655 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #570 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-08 Act 472
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2018-03-29HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 19th, 18th, 17th
2018-03-27HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 13th, 34th, 121st
2018-03-27HouseHouse Insisted
2018-03-27SenateSenate Insisted
2018-03-23HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-21SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2018-03-21SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-12SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-13HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-12HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback