GA HB900 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-86 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates promoting or supporting certain worthy agencies, funds, or nonprofit corporations with proceeds disbursed to the general fund and the agency, fund, or nonprofit corporation, so as to amend the logo design for special license plates issued to support breast cancer related programs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special license plates; logo design issued to support breast cancer related programs; amend
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Susan Holmes [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] |
Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House Vote #499 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-05 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57243 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/189502 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57243#17459 |