GA HB90 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 12 of Title 51 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to damages for conversion of timber, so as to provide that certain persons, firms, or corporations who are buyers of land for conversion of timber shall be exempt from certain liabilities; to limit damages for certain causes of action brought for conversion of timber; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Torts; certain persons, firms, or corporations who are buyers of land for conversion of timber shall be exempt from certain liabilities; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #198 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - Passage: House Vote #52 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07 Effective Date 2021-07-01
2021-05-07 Act 255
2021-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-09SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-03-09SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-01SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-26SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-18SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-17HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-02-17HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-11HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-01-27HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-26HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback