GA HB9 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Mar 1 @ 4:00 pm in 307 CLOB
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to wiretapping, eavesdropping, surveillance, and related offenses, so as to prohibit the use of a device to film under or through a person's clothing under certain circumstances; to provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and offenses; use of device to film under or through person's clothing under certain circumstances; prohibit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-17 - House Vote #68 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-21SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-17HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-17HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-11HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-10HouseHouse Hopper
2016-11-21HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback