GA HB897 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6B of Title 10 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the "Uniform Power of Attorney Act," so as to revise the short title; to provide for definitions; to change provisions relating to the application of Chapter 6 of this title; to update cross-references to federal law; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Power of Attorney Act; revise

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #634 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Vote #662 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-07 Act 412
2018-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-19SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-19SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-12SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-12HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback