GA HB896 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-5-40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions for property tax exemptions, so as to update the population bracket and census date for a certain property tax exemption for certain leased property; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; update population bracket and census date for a certain property tax exemption for certain leased property
Sponsors
Rep. Clint Crowe [R] | Rep. Susan Holmes [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Passage: House Vote #561 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-12 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/61111 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/203298 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/61111#19207 |