GA HB896 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 29 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to guardian and ward, so as to change provisions relating to guardians and conservators of adults; to recognize certain provisions of the "Uniform Adult Guardianship and Conservatorship Proceedings Jurisdiction Act" in connection with the appointment of a guardian or conservator of adults and the jurisdiction for such petitions; to change provisions relating to the termination of an emergency guardianship; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Guardian and ward; guardians and conservators of adults; change provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52693 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/172970 |