GA HB896 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 8 of Title 17 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to continuances, so as to change provisions relating to a continuance in a speedy trial demand case involving a witness who is on active duty as a member of the National Guard or component of the armed forces of the United States; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Continuances; witness on active duty; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Allison [R] | Rep. Hinton Amerson [R] | Rep. Doug Collins [R] | Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] |
Rep. Billy Maddox [R] | Sen. John Wiles [R] | Rep. John Yates [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-09 - House - House Vote #561 - Pass (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 23 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-02-09 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-09 | House Third Readers | |
2010-02-03 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-14 | House Second Readers | |
2010-01-13 | House First Readers | |
2009-12-17 | House Prefiled |