GA HB895 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for the assessment of no points and a maximum fine for the offense of failure to obey a traffic control device in certain instances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; assessment of no points and maximum fine for the offense of failure to obey a traffic control device in certain instances; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Setzler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-05 | House | House Hopper |