GA HB895 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to schedules, offenses, and penalties regarding the regulation of controlled substances, so as to prohibit the sale to and by minors of drug products containing dextromethorphan; to provide for definitions; to provide for proper identification; to provide for penalties; to provide for statutory construction; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; sale to and by minors of drug products containing dextromethorphan; prohibit
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House Hopper |