GA HB887 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 36, 38, 46, 48, and 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to local government, military, emergency management, and veteran affairs, public utilities and public transportation, revenue and taxation, and state government respectively, so as to facilitate and incentivize adequate and expanded broadband and other communications services throughout the state; to provide for legislative findings and intent; to provide short titles; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Communications Services Tax Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #729 (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #730 (Y: 26 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #731 (Y: 28 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #732 (Y: 27 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #733 (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #633 (Y: 170 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-19SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-19SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/887
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/172900.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175105.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175474.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175594.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/176920.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178275.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178278.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178077.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178037.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178325.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15866
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16238
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16237
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16236
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16235
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16234

Bill Comments

feedback