GA HB886 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to provide for sealing of ballots and unused security paper in secure containers; to provide for chain of custody documentation and procedures; to provide for storage of unused security paper; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections; sealing of ballots and unused security paper in secure containers; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Rob Leverett [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Dale Washburn [R] |
Rep. Tyler Smith [R] | Rep. Clint Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-12 | House | House Hopper |