GA HB885 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to county boards of health, so as to repeal a statute relating to the option for certain counties to create a county board of health and wellness by ordinance; to provide for an effective date; to provide for transition to county boards of health; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health; certain counties to create a county board of health and wellness by ordinance; repeal statute
Sponsors
Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Betty Price [R] | Rep. Beth Beskin [R] | Rep. Brad Raffensperger [R] |
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #781 (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #896 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Vote #531 (Y: 151 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #896 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Vote #531 (Y: 151 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-27 | Act 467 | |
2016-04-27 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-02 | House | House Hopper |