GA HB878 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Effective Date 2022-04-18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Effective Date 2022-04-18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of Clayton County, approved January 28, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, p. 2032), as amended, so as to provide for the salary of the solicitor-general of the state court; to provide for supplements; to provide a salary cap; to provide that the solicitor-general of said court may employ such assistant solicitors-general, deputy solicitors-general, or other attorneys, investigators, paraprofessionals, clerical assistants, or other employees or independent contractors as may be authorized by the Board of Commissioners of Clayton County; to provide for compensation; to provide for qualifications; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Clayton County; State Court; provide salary of solicitor-general
Sponsors
Rep. Rhonda Burnough [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] | Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] |
Rep. Yasmin Neal [D] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #501 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - Local Calendar Without Hb881 & Hb890: House Vote #451 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - Local Calendar Without Hb881 & Hb890: House Vote #451 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Effective Date 2022-04-18 | |
2022-04-18 | Act 606 | |
2022-04-18 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-01-24 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-01-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-01-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-12 | House | House Hopper |