GA HB877 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to taxes on tobacco products, so as to lessen the tax rate on modified risk tobacco products; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; tax rate on modified risk tobacco products; lessen

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #656 (Y: 59 N: 109 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Reading Lost
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-12HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback