GA HB871 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sales and use taxes, so as to create an exemption from state sales and use tax for 50 percent of the sales price of manufactured homes to be converted into real property in this state; to require proof of a qualifying purchase; to provide for recapture for unproven exemptions; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax; 50 percent of the sales price of manufactured homes; create exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #808 (Y: 160 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #805 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #715 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #571 (Y: 168 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-07 Act 432
2018-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2018-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-27SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/871
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/172740.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/173976.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175137.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/177244.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178559.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178953.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15774
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16220
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16198
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16399
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16256

Bill Comments

feedback