GA HB870 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of South Fulton in Fulton County, Georgia, approved April 26, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, p. 3726), so as to change the corporate boundaries of the municipality; to provide for related matters; to provide a contingent effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

South Fulton, City of; change corporate boundaries

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #742 (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #663 (Y: 31 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #630 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Veto V12
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-27SenateSenate Taken from Table
2018-03-23SenateSenate Tabled
2018-03-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback