GA HB870 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 9 of Chapter 21 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Brain and Spinal Injury Trust Fund, so as to provide for the imposition of an additional fine for reckless driving; to provide for the disposition of such fine; to provide for related matters; to provide for a contingent effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Brain and Spinal Injury Trust Fund; imposition of additional fine for reckless driving; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. Culver Kidd [I] | Rep. Tom Dickson [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #669 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #681 (Y: 156 N: 11 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #681 (Y: 156 N: 11 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-15 | Act 522 | |
2014-04-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-28 | House | House Hopper |