GA HB868 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Education and Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Education and Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 12 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to commissions and other agencies, so as to eliminate the Georgia State Games Commission; to provide for reversion of property to the state; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; Georgia State Games Commission; eliminate
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] | Rep. Tom Kirby [R] |
Rep. Jodi Lott [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #660 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-28 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/47897 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/155901 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/47897#14180 |