GA HB867 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 8 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regional commissions, so as to create the Commission on Regional Planning; to provide for the membership and duties for such commission; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Commission on Regional Planning; create; provide for membership and duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #770 - Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House Vote #588 - Pass (Y: 135 N: 24 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House Vote #588 - Pass (Y: 135 N: 24 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-25 | Act 467 | |
2010-05-25 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-02-18 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-18 | House Third Readers | |
2010-02-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-12 | House Second Readers | |
2010-01-11 | House First Readers |