GA HB866 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 34 of Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to identity theft, so as to prohibit consumer credit reporting agencies from charging a fee for placing or removing a security freeze on a consumer's account; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commerce and trade; charging fee for placing a security freeze on a consumer's account; prohibit consumer credit reporting agencies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #580 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback