GA HB863 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Stockbridge, approved April 4, 1991 (Ga. L. 1991, p. 4359), as amended, so as to revise the manner of filling vacancies on the governing authority; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Stockbridge, City of; filling vacancies on the governing authority; revise manner
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-04 - House - House Vote #490 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-27 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/47868 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/155804 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/47868#13890 |