GA HB863 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 17 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to charitable solicitations, so as to revise certain provisions related to charitable solicitations; to require certain information be provided as part of the accounting relating to certain contributions; to provide for applicability of provisions relating to disclosures required by charitable organizations, paid solicitors, or solicitor agents; to provide requirements for use of collection receptacles for certain donations; to define a certain term; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Charitable solicitations; accounting; revise certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Allen Peake [R] |
Sen. David Shafer [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #769 - Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-27 | Act 497 | |
2010-05-27 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-10 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-17 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-11 | House Second Readers | |
2009-04-03 | House First Readers |