GA HB860 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 16 of Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Uniform Civil Forfeiture Procedure Act, so as to require reporting of property seized and forfeited to the Carl Vinson Institute of Government of the University of Georgia; to provide for a definition; to require the reporting of certain information; to establish a case tracking system and searchable public website of such information; to provide for reporting requirements; to provide for civil penalties; to provide for audits and public information; to provide for a duty of the Attorney General; to provide for rules; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Civil Forfeiture Procedure Act; reporting of property seized and forfeited to the Carl Vinson Institute of Government; require

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-26HouseHouse Second Readers
2022-01-25HouseHouse First Readers
2022-01-24HouseHouse Hopper
2021-11-22HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback