GA HB86 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 27 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to lottery for education, so as to provide for the lottery game of sports wagering in this state; to provide for and revise certain definitions; to provide for oversight of such lottery game by the Georgia Lottery Corporation and its board of directors; to provide for a short title; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for additional powers and duties of the corporation and its board of directors; to provide for procedures, limitations, requirements, qualifications, and licensing; to regulate wagers and provide requirements for bettors; to provide for bettors to restrict themselves from placing certain wagers; to provide certain resources for individuals with a gambling problem or a gambling disorder; to provide for the collection and disposition of taxes; to provide for violations and penalties; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Lottery Mobile Sports Wagering Integrity Act; enact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-03-01HouseHouse Postponed
2021-02-26HouseHouse Postponed
2021-02-25HouseHouse Postponed
2021-02-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-10HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-02-03HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-01-27HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-26HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback