GA HB86 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 19-7-5 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to reporting of child abuse, so as to expand the definition of sexual abuse to include acts involving trafficking a person for sexual servitude; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic relations; definition of sexual abuse; expand

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #184 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #90 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08 Effective Date
2017-05-08 Act 168
2017-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-14SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-13SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-23SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-22HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-02-22HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-01-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-24HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-23HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback