GA HB86 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Veto V4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to services for the aging, so as to provide for the transfer of the Division of Aging Services to the Georgia Adult and Aging Services Agency; to provide for definitions; to provide for the Georgia Adult and Aging Services Board; to provide for membership, powers, and duties; to provide for an executive director; to provide for transfer of rights, duties, and obligations; to amend various provisions of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated so as to make conforming changes; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Social services; provide for transfer of the Division of Aging Services to the Georgia Adult and Aging Services Agency; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #194 (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Vote #28 (Y: 160 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12 Veto V4
2015-05-12HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2015-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2015-03-24SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2015-03-24SenateSenate Third Read
2015-02-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2015-02-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2015-02-12SenateSenate Read and Referred
2015-02-11HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2015-02-11HouseHouse Third Readers
2015-02-04HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2015-01-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2015-01-27HouseHouse First Readers
2015-01-26HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback