GA HB86 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for compensation for the judge of the State Court of Putnam County, the solicitor of the State Court of Putnam County, and the clerk of the State Court of Putnam County, approved April 1, 1996 (Ga. L. 1996, p. 3721), so as to change the compensation for the judge of the State Court of Putnam County and the solicitor-general of the State Court of Putnam County; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Putnam County State Court; judge and solicitor-general; change compensation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #94 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House Vote #15 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-01 Effective Date
2013-04-24 Act 55
2013-04-24HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2013-04-01HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2013-03-04SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2013-03-04SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2013-02-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2013-01-31HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2013-01-31HouseHouse Third Readers
2013-01-31HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2013-01-29HouseHouse Second Readers
2013-01-28HouseHouse First Readers
2013-01-17HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback