GA HB859 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 16 of Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Uniform Civil Forfeiture Procedure Act, so as to provide that certain property is exempt from seizure or forfeiture under the Uniform Civil Forfeiture Procedure Act; to provide for a duty of the Attorney General; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Uniform Civil Forfeiture Procedure Act; certain property is exempt from seizure; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-24 | House | House Hopper |
2021-11-22 | House | House Prefiled |