GA HB856 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-10 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the O.C.G.A., relating to public assistance, so as to make insulin accessible to individuals who are in urgent need of a short-term affordable insulin supply; to provide for a pharmacy to dispense one additional short-term affordable urgent insulin supply under certain conditions; to require the Department of Community Health to develop an application form, an information sheet, and satisfaction surveys regarding such program; to require a manufacturer of insulin to establish procedures to make insulin available under such program; to provide for enforcement, penalties, and appellate procedures; to provide for reporting; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urgent Insulin Safety Net Program Act; enact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2024-01-09HouseHouse First Readers
2024-01-08HouseHouse Hopper
2023-11-29HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback