GA HB856 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 9 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions for probate courts, so as to change provisions relating to the bond required for probate court judges; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Probate courts; bond required for judges; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Tom Weldon [R] | Rep. Beth Beskin [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Vote #590 (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Vote #590 (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-27 | House | House Hopper |