GA HB854 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 60 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions applicable to counties and municipal corporations, so as to define battery charged fence; to provide for minimum standards of such fences; to prohibit additional permitting or regulation of battery charged fences by counties and municipal corporations; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; battery charged fences; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Rep. Heath Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #626 (Y: 153 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-10 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-30 | House | House Hopper |