GA HB847 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 9 of Title 16 and Article 1 of Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the O.C.G.A., relating to fraud and related offenses and general provisions relative to public assistance, respectively, so as to redesignate Code Section 49-4-15, relating to fraud in obtaining public assistance, food stamps, or Medicaid, penalties, and recovery of overpayments, as new Code Section 16-9-63; to revise terminology in said Code Section 16-9-63; to reserve the Code Section 49-4-15 designation; to revise Article 7 of Chapter 8 of Title 34 and Chapter 7A of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to benefits relative to employment security and tax credits; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; fraud in obtaining public assistance; redesignate and revise Code Sections
Sponsors
Rep. David Clark [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Rep. Erica Thomas [D] |
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Patty Stinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - House Vote #559 (Y: 140 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-26 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/47805 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/155652 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/47805#13988 |