GA HB840 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-23 - Effective Date 2022-02-23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-23 - Effective Date 2022-02-23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to incorporate the City of Vinings; to provide a charter; to provide for penalties; to provide for definitions and construction; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide for a referendum; to provide effective dates and transitional provisions governing the transfer of various functions and responsibilities from Cobb County to the City of Vinings; to provide for severability; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Vinings, City of; incorporate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Motion To Immediately Transmit: Senate Vote #539 (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #538 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Passage: House Vote #494 (Y: 99 N: 56 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #538 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Passage: House Vote #494 (Y: 99 N: 56 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Effective Date 2022-02-23 | |
2022-02-23 | Act 518 | |
2022-02-23 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-23 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-07 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-02-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-31 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-29 | House | House Hopper |