GA HB840 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1A of Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to nonpublic postsecondary educational institutions, so as to provide for biennial review of institutions rather than programs; to provide for awards of costs and reasonable attorney's fees in favor of the commission; to provide for alternative review of renewal applications by institutions in good standing with recognized accrediting agencies; to provide for filing a surety bond in the event of a change of ownership of an institution; to provide for the remittal of surety bonds; to provide for assessment of investigation costs incurred by the commission; to provide for related matters; to provide for conforming changes; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Nonpublic postsecondary educational institutions; biennial review of institutions rather than programs; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Steven Sainz [R] |
Rep. Jan Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-29 | House | House Hopper |