GA HB84 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide for consumer protections regarding health insurance; to provide for definitions; to provide for disclosure requirements of providers, hospitals, and insurers; to provide for billing, reimbursement, and arbitration of certain services; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; provide for consumer protections regarding health insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] |
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #222 (Y: 77 N: 78 NV: 10 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-04 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House Hopper |