GA HB84 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance generally, so as to prohibit denial of an aircraft claim unless the insured's action or failure to act had a direct causal connection to the loss upon which the claim is based; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; denial of an aircraft claim unless the insured's action or failure to act had a direct causal connection to loss upon which claim is based; prohibit
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Geoff Duncan [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] |
Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #340 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #243 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #243 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 105 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-08 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-26 | House | House Hopper |