GA HB838 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 24-5-510 and Article 8 of Chapter 2 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to privileged communications between law enforcement officers and peer counselors and Office of Public Safety Officer Support, respectively, so as to change the name of the Office of Public Safety Officer Support; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement officers and agencies; Office of Public Safety Officer Support; change the name

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #698 (Y: 33 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Vote #701 (Y: 92 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Vote #488 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-01 Effective Date
2020-08-05 Act 569
2020-08-05HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-25HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-23HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2020-06-23SenateSenate Transmitted House
2020-06-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-23SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-19SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-02-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-02-25HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-01-30HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-01-29HouseHouse First Readers
2020-01-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback