GA HB830 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to controlled substances, so as to change certain provisions relating to Schedules I and II controlled substances; to change certain provisions relating to the definition of dangerous drug; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances; Schedule I and II; change certain provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #609 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Vote #557 (Y: 161 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Effective Date
2018-05-03 Act 373
2018-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-14SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-14SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-12SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-26SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-07HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-06HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-05HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback