GA HB826 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Effective Date 2022-02-22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Effective Date 2022-02-22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to incorporate the City of Lost Mountain; to provide a charter; to provide for definitions and construction; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide for a referendum; to provide effective dates and transitional provisions governing the transfer of various functions and responsibilities from Cobb County to the City of Lost Mountain; to provide for severability; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Lost Mountain, City of; incorporate
Sponsors
Rep. Ginny Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Rep. Devan Seabaugh [R] |
Rep. Matt Dollar [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #551 (Y: 98 N: 64 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #530 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Immediately Transmit: House Vote #493 (Y: 94 N: 58 NV: 7 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Passage: House Vote #492 (Y: 92 N: 61 NV: 6 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #530 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Immediately Transmit: House Vote #493 (Y: 94 N: 58 NV: 7 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Passage: House Vote #492 (Y: 92 N: 61 NV: 6 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Effective Date 2022-02-22 | |
2022-02-22 | Act 517 | |
2022-02-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-22 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-22 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-07 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-02-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-29 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-25 | House | House Hopper |