GA HB826 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 34 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medical practice relative to physicians, assistants, and others, so as to provide for certain requirements for advertisement or publication of representations of board certification by physicians; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Medical practice; physicians; provide for certain requirements for advertisement or publication of representations of board certification
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Price [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Ed Rynders [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] |
Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - House Vote #557 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-22 | House | House Hopper |