GA HB824 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Legislative Retirement System, so as to increase the retirement allowance; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Legislative Retirement System; retirement allowance; increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #882 (Y: 43 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #715 (Y: 151 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #715 (Y: 151 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 747 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-29 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-25 | House | House Hopper |