GA HB82 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 12-3-402 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Oconee River Greenway Authority, so as to allow certain members to appoint a designee; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Oconee River Greenway Authority; certain members to appoint a designee; allow
Sponsors
Rep. Culver Kidd [I] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - House Vote #108 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-26 | House | House Hopper |