GA HB815 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sales and use taxes, so as to exempt from taxation local authorities providing public water or sewer service; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; local authorities providing public water or sewer service; exempt
Sponsors
Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Tommy Benton [R] |
Rep. Tom Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House Vote #533 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-27 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56848 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/188409 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56848#17524 |