GA HB815 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 26 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to meat inspection, so as to provide for the inspection and regulation of certain avian meat products and facilities related to the processing of such products for human consumption; to provide for uniformity; to remove an obsolete provision relating to enforcement responsibility; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Meat inspection; inspection and regulation of certain avian meat products and facilities; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Bruce Broadrick [R] | Rep. Charles Williams [R] |
Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Mack Jackson [D] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #607 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Vote #492 (Y: 158 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Vote #492 (Y: 158 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 451 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2016-02-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-03 | House | House Postponed |
2016-01-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-22 | House | House Hopper |