GA HB807 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the creation of one or more community improvement districts in the City of St. Marys; to provide for a short title; to provide for the purposes of such districts; to provide for definitions; to provide for boards to administer said districts; to provide for the appointment and election of members of such boards; to provide for taxes, fees, and assessments; to provide for the boundaries of such districts; to provide for bonded indebtedness; to provide for cooperation with local governments; to provide for powers of such boards; to provide for construction; to provide that no notice, proceeding, publication, or referendum shall be required; to provide for dissolution; to provide the procedures connected with all of the foregoing; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of St. Marys Community Improvement Districts Act of 2018; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #588 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Vote #475 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Effective Date
2018-05-03 Act 342
2018-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-09SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-12SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-08HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-08HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-06HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-05HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-01HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback