GA HB806 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act restating and reenacting a certain homestead exemption from ad valorem taxes levied for county and school purposes and a certain homestead exemption from ad valorem taxes levied for county purposes in Twiggs County, approved March 20, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 3935), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 5, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 4359), so as to increase the amount of the income cap on the exemption granted to certain residents 62 years of age or older; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, automatic repeal, mandatory execution of election, and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Twiggs County; ad valorem tax; increase income cap on homestead exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Supplemental Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #372 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #297 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #297 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Effective Date 2023-05-01 | |
2023-05-01 | Act 221 | |
2023-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-21 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-20 | House | House Hopper |